THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 11:58:43 AM
Marcus, Jonathan Mayer
CPSO#:
64407
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Aug 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Aug 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
5230 Dundas Street West
MCI the Doctors' Office
Six Points Plaza
Etobicoke ON M9B 1A8
Phone: (416)234-8668
Fax: (416)234-8720
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 1995 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JONATHAN MAYER MARCUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCUS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 12 Aug 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 May 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 May 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 1996 |