THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 15:56:32 PM
Gibson, Michael
CPSO#:
64391
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jun 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
170 Simcoe Street
Peterborough ON K9H 2H7
Phone: (705) 748-4011
Fax: (705) 741-6340
Electoral District: 06
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Michael Gibson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 27 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nova Scotia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jun 1992 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL GIBSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIBSON is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Sep 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1992 |