THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 20:19:19 PM
Patterson, Judy Louise
CPSO#:
64349
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jun 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jun 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Grant, Judy Louise Patterson (used until: 29 May 2006 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
99 Kakulu Rd.
Kanata ON K2L 3C8
Phone: 613-592-1448
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1988 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JUDY LOUISE PATTERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATTERSON is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 1991 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jun 2006 |