THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:27:16 AM
Marriott, Michael Andrew
CPSO#:
64336
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 May 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 May 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
786 Goderich St
Port Elgin ON N0H 2C3
Phone: 519-832-9600
Fax: 519-376-9515
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound |
Owen Sound |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital |
Southampton |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre |
Kincardine |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jun 1992 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:05 Dec 1997 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL ANDREW MARRIOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARRIOTT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 23 Jul 1991 to 02 Sep 1991
EL - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jan 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Sep 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 May 1992 |