THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 23:55:22 PM
Doan, Richard Joseph
CPSO#:
64321
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
30 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jul 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Yale University, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Richard J. Doan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 30 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients who accessed care at Inner City Health Associates between 2007 and 2021and are seeking a copy of their medical record may contact:
Inner City Heath Associates
145 Front Street E, Unit G2
Toronto, ON M5A 1E3
phone: 416-591-4411
fax: 416-640-2072
Patients who accessed at Michael Garron Hospital from 2003-2012 and are seeking a copy of their medical record may contact:
Michael Garron Hospital
Health Records Office
Room A126
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto, ON M4C 3E7
phone: 416-469-6821
Patients who accessed care at Scarborough Centre for Health Communities from 2018-2021 and are seeking a copy of their medical record may contact:
Scarborough Centre for Health Communities
2660 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto, ON M1K 2S3
phone: 416-640-7391
fax: 416-261-1896
Patients who accessed care at the Centre for Addiction and Mental Health from 2001-2008 and are seeking a copy of their medical record may contact:
CAMH
Health Records – Release of Information Department
100 Stokes Street, 7th Floor
Toronto, Ontario M6J 1H4
phone: 416 535-8501, ext. 32318
fax: 416 979-6934
Date Received: 08 Mar 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:15 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1991 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 May 2022 |