THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 17:45:51 PM
Roy, Paul Damien
CPSO#:
64298
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jul 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jul 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Manitoba, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
10A Canadian Forces Dr
Petawawa ON K8H 0H4
Phone: 1-613-687-5511 Ext. 242-4100
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:16 Nov 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAUL DAMIEN ROY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1991 |