THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 0:10:27 AM
Spiegel, Lynn Reesa
CPSO#:
64295
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Jul 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Jul 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Rheumatology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7711
Fax: (416) 813-4989
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:10 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LYNN REESA SPIEGEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPIEGEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Aug 1997
Resident 5 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1991 |