THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 14:29:40 PM
Lena, Anthony Ilango
CPSO#:
64293
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Oct 1994
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Mar 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: University of Ceylon, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
106-704 Mara St
Point Edward ON N7V 1X4
Phone: 519 5426512
Fax: 519 5428831
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Sri Lanka
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bluewater Health |
Sarnia |
Bluewater Health,Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site |
Petrolia |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:31 Dec 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANTHONY ILANGO LENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LENA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Oct 1994 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Mar 1995 |