THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 4:04:52 AM
Milenkovic, Svetlana Ljubomir
CPSO#:
64286
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Feb 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jul 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Serbian
Education: University of Belgrade, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 407
2333 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON M6R 3A6
Phone: (416) 516-6337
Fax: (416) 516-0073
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:20 Nov 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SVETLANA LJUBOMIR MILENKOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILENKOVIC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Feb 1997 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Feb 1998 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 1999 |