THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 4:22:18 AM
Hossie, Helen Lynne
CPSO#:
64269
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
05 Mar 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Helen Hossie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 10 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Filebank Records Storage, 488 Carlingview Drive, Etobicoke, ON M9W 6M8
Date Received: 01 May 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:20 Nov 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Oct 1993 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Mar 1998 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |