THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 3:42:25 AM
Cho, Jae-Hoon Hoon
CPSO#:
64243
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jun 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Aug 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Korean
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2-7077 Bathurst Street
Thornhill ON L4J 2J6
Phone: 905-709-1366
Fax: 905-771-6726
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAE-HOON HOON CHO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHO is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1991 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Nov 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 02 Nov 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 09 May 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 10 Jun 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 12 Jun 2018 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 2019 |