THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 8:25:28 AM
Hendel, Raymond Gregory
CPSO#:
64241
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Nov 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Nov 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
257 Larch Street
Sudbury ON P3B 1M2
Phone: (705) 674-9677
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
North Bay Regional Health Centre - Kirkwood Place |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:20 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:24 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAYMOND GREGORY HENDEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENDEL is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1991 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Nov 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: July 19, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)