THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 11:04:24 AM
Blois, Heather Susan
CPSO#:
64227
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jun 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
875 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1S 5P1
Phone: 613-725-2000 Ext. 708
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Heather Blois Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 17 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Dec 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HEATHER SUSAN BLOIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLOIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1991 |