THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 8:00:13 AM
Chen, Robert E Wei
CPSO#:
64219
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jan 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jan 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: University of Cambridge School of Clinic, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
7 MC 409
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5207
Fax: (416) 603-5004
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Hong Kong S A R
USA - Virginia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:21 Nov 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT E WEI CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jan 1996 |