THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 9:07:58 AM
Khattak, Mohammad Sohail
CPSO#:
64200
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jun 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Nov 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Pashto, Persian, Urdu
Education: University of Peshawar, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 301
300 Rossland Road East
Ajax ON L1Z 0M1
Phone: (905) 683-4440
Fax: (905) 683-3303
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:04 Nov 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD SOHAIL KHATTAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHATTAK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 May 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Nov 1997 |