THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 6:42:23 AM
Pandith, Vikas
CPSO#:
64166
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jul 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: University of Toronto, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
202-2200 Fairview St
Burlington ON L7R 4H9
Phone: 289-635-2272
Fax: 905-554-3671
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:23 Nov 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VIKAS PANDITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANDITH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Rheumatology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 1992 |