THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 12:58:34 PM
Singal, Sewa Ram
CPSO#:
64152
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Dec 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Dec 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Punjabi University, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
2115 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON M3N 2V6
Phone: (416) 741-6111
Fax: (416) 741-6121
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:05 Nov 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SEWA RAM SINGAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Sep 1992
CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Jul 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Dec 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Dec 1996 |