THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 4:31:09 AM
Somska, Elena
CPSO#:
64146
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
21 Nov 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jul 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
21-Nov-2021
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Czech, English, Polish, Russian, Slovak
Education: University of Komenskeho, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients may contact the address above for their medical record.
Records Management Ltd
13 - 1 High Meadow Place
Toronto, ON M9L 0B3
Phone: 1-800-775-0093
Fax: 647-933-2904
Date Received: 31 May 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 1992 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 21 Nov 2021 |