THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 9:00:14 AM
Jetly, Rakesh
CPSO#:
64129
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jun 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jun 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
C F Health Services GP HQ
101 Colonel By Drive
Carling Campus, Building 9
Ottawa ON K1A 0K2
Phone: 613-410-2982
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAKESH JETLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JETLY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1992 |