THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 0:28:45 AM
Kapoor, Anil
CPSO#:
64125
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
28 Feb 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 May 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
28-Feb-2023
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: A. Kapoor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 7 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: September 13, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
By way of letter dated September 13, 2021, the College was notified by St. Joseph’s Healthcare Hamilton, pursuant to s.33(c) of the Public Hospitals Act and s. 85.5(2) of the Regulated Health Professions Act, that on June 9, 2020, Dr. Anil Kapoor voluntarily agreed not to exercise his privileges to perform nephrectomies or kidney transplants pending the results of an external review.
The letter further notified that on July 7, 2021, Dr. Kapoor voluntarily agreed not to exercise his privileges to carry out his on-call duties or operate in the main OR.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:24 Aug 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 May 1999 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 28 Feb 2023 |