THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 6:34:54 AM
Woolfrey, Karen Grace Howell
CPSO#:
64112
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jun 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jun 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 667-6538
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - North Carolina
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brant Community Healthcare System |
Brantford |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KAREN GRACE HOWELL WOOLFREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOOLFREY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1992 |