THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 18:38:46 PM
Stern, Alex
CPSO#:
64078
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 Jul 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hungarian
Education: University of Toronto, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Alex Stern Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 12 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain copies of the medical charts should contact above.
Records Management Ltd.
13-1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Toll free: 1-800-775-0093
Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 11 Apr 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Dec 1993 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 1992 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2019 |