THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 4:52:29 AM
Ferreira, Nelson De Brito
CPSO#:
64072
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jun 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: University of Toronto, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Medcan
150 York Street
Suite 1500
Toronto ON M5H 3S5
Phone: (416) 350-5900
Fax: (416) 350-5980
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Jun 1993 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NELSON DE BRITO FERREIRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERREIRA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1992 |