THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 10:24:16 AM
Buck, Erica Aletta Margarethe
CPSO#:
64057
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
507 Main St
Powassan and Area Family Health Tea
Powassan ON P0H 1Z0
Phone: 705- 724 -1020
Electoral District: 08
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Erica Buck Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 28 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North Bay General Hospital,Civic Site |
North Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Jun 1993 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ERICA ALETTA MARGARETHE BUCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUCK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 1992 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 27 Aug 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2000 |