THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 10:17:00 AM
Lee, Mary Ching Yu
CPSO#:
64051
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jun 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jun 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: University of Toronto, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
340 College St
Suite 220
Toronto ON M5T 3A9
Phone: 416-323-9440 Ext. 226
Fax: 416-572-5875
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 Nov 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:23 Nov 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARY CHING YU LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 23 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
CF - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1992 |