THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 10:44:26 AM
Maurice, Michael Jude
CPSO#:
64020
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Jun 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jun 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
564 Belmont Ave.
Suite 409
Kitchener ON N2M 5N6
Phone: (519) 584-0180
Fax: (519) 584-0182
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:31 Dec 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JUDE MAURICE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAURICE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 3 - General Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1992 |