THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 6:25:15 AM
Altomare, Filiberto
CPSO#:
64016
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Jul 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Jul 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: University of Toronto, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
8 Donnelly Wing South
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 867-3708
Fax: (416) 867-7482
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Filiberto Altomare Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 4 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FILIBERTO ALTOMARE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALTOMARE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1992 |