THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 19:33:02 PM
Yoo, John Heung Joon
CPSO#:
64014
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Feb 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Feb 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Korean
Education: University of Toronto, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
Suite B3-433
800 Commissioners Road
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8457
Fax: (519) 685-8567
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:05 Sep 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN HEUNG JOON YOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Feb 1993 |