THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 6:13:36 AM
Lloyd, Robert Jeffrey
CPSO#:
63997
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jul 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Room HSC 3Y
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76610
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: RJ Lloyd Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 28 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:26 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT JEFFREY LLOYD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LLOYD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 10 Jan 1996 to 04 Feb 1996
EL - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Critical Care
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 1992 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jan 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Feb 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1998 |