THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 22:47:25 PM
Kowalchuk, Glenn
CPSO#:
63987
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jun 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jul 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
448 Welland Ave, Unit 5
St Catharines ON L2M 7V3
Phone: 905-988-1323
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GLENN KOWALCHUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOWALCHUK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1992 |