THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 22:46:04 PM
Chiodo, Albino chiodo
CPSO#:
63953
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Sep 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Sep 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: University of Toronto, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 216
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON M4C 5T2
Phone: (416) 510-9962
Fax: (416) 510-9963
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
USA - North Carolina
USA - Rhode Island
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALBINO CHIODO CHIODO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIODO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 1992 |