THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 2:56:52 AM
Pandey, Amritanshu Shekhar
CPSO#:
63944
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jun 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jul 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of Toronto, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
150 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON N1R 6V6
Phone: (519) 624-3511
Fax: (519) 624-3411
Electoral District: 03
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:27 Nov 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMRITANSHU SHEKHAR PANDEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANDEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 27 Feb 1998
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 1992 |