THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 8:55:57 AM
Laredo, Esther Sheila
CPSO#:
63940
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member - CPSO Staff as of
08 Jan 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jun 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: University of Toronto, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
825 Coxwell Ave
Michael Garron Hospital
B120
East York ON M4C 3E7
Phone: 4164696580 Ext. 6282
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:06 Sep 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ESTHER SHEILA LAREDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAREDO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1992 |