THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:42:23 AM
Auyeung, Anthony
CPSO#:
63928
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Mar 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
208 Bloor St W
Suite 405
Toronto ON M5S 3B4
Phone: 416 260-2004
Fax: 4162602794
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANTHONY AUYEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUYEUNG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1992 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jul 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Mar 1999 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 01 Sep 2006 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 Jun 2006
Summary:
On June 26, 2006, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found that Dr. Anthony Auyeung committed professional misconduct in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. The Committee ordered and directed that:
1. The Registrar suspend Dr. Auyeung(s certificate of registration for a period of three (3) months, one (1) month of which shall be suspended if Dr. Auyeung successfully completes, at his own expense, the College(s Boundaries Course and the College(s Medical Ethics Course and provides proof thereof to the College. The commencement date for the suspension is July 1, 2006.
2. Dr. Auyeung pay costs to the College in the amount of $2,500.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 26, 2006