THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 20:28:29 PM
Beland, Renee Loretta
CPSO#:
63868
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jun 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
649 Scottsdale Dr
Suite 302
Guelph ON N1G 4T7
Phone: 519-837-2283
Fax: 519-767-2262
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Jun 1993 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RENEE LORETTA BELAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELAND is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1992 |