THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 10:22:29 AM
Al-Hashmi, Ibrahim Murtada Mohammed
CPSO#:
63864
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jun 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jul 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
107 - 81 The East Mall
Etobicoke ON M8Z 5W3
Phone: (416) 234-5442
Fax: (416) 234-1483
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:10 Jun 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IBRAHIM MURTADA MOHAMMED AL-HASHMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-HASHMI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Paediatric Haematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
CF - Paediatric Haematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Paediatric Haematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Paediatric Haematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Paediatric Haematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 1997 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1998 |