THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 4:11:40 AM
Miller, Christine Anne
CPSO#:
63863
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
30 May 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jun 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Names:
Miller-Hart, Christine Anne (used until: 04 Apr 2012 )
Miller, Christine Anne (used until: 06 Dec 1992 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: October 13, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On October 13, 2017, Providence Care notified the College, pursuant to s.33 of the Public Hospitals Act and s.85.5 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that on September 6, 2017, Dr. Christine Miller resigned her privileges at Providence Care during the course of, or as a result of, an investigation by Providence Care into Dr. Miller’s professional conduct.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jun 1992 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Jul 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Dec 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Dec 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1992 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 May 2023 |