THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 0:51:56 AM
MacMillan, Brent Michael
CPSO#:
63846
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Mar 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON K9V 4M8
Phone: (705) 324-6111
Fax: (705) 328-6237
Electoral District: 06
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Northwest Territories
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Minden Hospital Site |
Minden |
Ross Memorial Hospital |
Lindsay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRENT MICHAEL MACMILLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACMILLAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Mar 1993 |