THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 9:56:25 AM
Chiu, Priscilla Pui Lam
CPSO#:
63794
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jun 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Aug 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, Chinese, English
Education: Queen's University, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Div. of General & Thoracic Surgery
Room 1518
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6405
Fax: (416) 813-7477
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:03 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric Surgery |
Effective:15 Sep 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PRISCILLA PUI LAM CHIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Resident 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
Resident 4 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
Resident 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
Resident 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Mar 2002
Resident 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Resident 5 - Paediatric Critical Care
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Resident 6 - Pediatric General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pediatric General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 1992 |