THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 1:29:07 AM
Blouin, Danielle
CPSO#:
63789
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 May 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 May 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 2368
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Jun 1993 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DANIELLE BLOUIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLOUIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Feb 1997 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 25 Nov 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 May 2002 |