THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 15:49:19 PM
Bordeleau, Louise Jeannine
CPSO#:
63785
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jun 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jun 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
Department of Oncology
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9711 Ext. 63123
Fax: (905) 575-6326
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:10 Sep 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LOUISE JEANNINE BORDELEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORDELEAU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Medical Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology
University of Ottawa, 06 Feb 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1992 |