THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:15:57 PM
De Odorico, Iris
CPSO#:
63771
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jul 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 111
279 Wharncliffe Road
London ON N6H 2C2
Phone: (519) 661-0275
Fax: (519) 661-0616
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:13 Mar 2014 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IRIS DE ODORICO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE ODORICO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1992 |