THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 18:05:56 PM
Ala, Brigitte Darleen
CPSO#:
63766
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jun 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Clear Medical Imaging
1568 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON N8X 1K7
Phone: (519) 256-4914
Fax: (519) 256-4358
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Erie Shores HealthCare |
Leamington |
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: October 17, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On October 18, 2017, Windsor Regional Hospital notified the College, pursuant to s.85.5 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, and s.33 of the Public Hospitals Act, that conditions were placed on Dr. Brigitte Ala’s privileges at Windsor Regional Hospital for the 2017/2018 credentialing year requiring Dr. Ala to complete an individualized professionalism coaching program.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRIGITTE DARLEEN ALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1992 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: June 18, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)