THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 9:20:57 AM
Niessen, Marcus Paul
CPSO#:
63749
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON N8W 5L7
Phone: (519) 254-2676
Fax: (519) 254-2659
Electoral District: 01
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:29 Aug 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARCUS PAUL NIESSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIESSEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Plastic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Plastic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
CF - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 1992 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Jan 2020 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 29 Jan 2020 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 05 May 2021 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 2021 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: February 5, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)