THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 7:52:05 AM
Suh, Kathryn Nuala
CPSO#:
63738
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Nov 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Division Of Infectious Diseases
Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 10297
Fax: (613) 761-5260
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:05 Sep 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KATHRYN NUALA SUH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Infectious Diseases
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Nov 1992 |