THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 20:34:54 PM
Spettigue, Wendy Jill
CPSO#:
63703
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Dec 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
Department of Psychiatry
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3609
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Sep 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WENDY JILL SPETTIGUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPETTIGUE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Sep 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 1992 |