THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 12:45:37 PM
Schuringa, Peter Colin Randolph
CPSO#:
63702
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jul 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
16 Andrew St
Handworx Inc
Kitchener ON N2H 5R2
Phone: 519-576-0620
Fax: 519-576-5729
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Groves Memorial Community Hospital |
Fergus |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:10 Sep 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PETER COLIN RANDOLPH SCHURINGA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHURINGA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 1992 |