THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 3:31:28 AM
Baran, Gregory Paul
CPSO#:
63696
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jul 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Mar 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
902 Portsmouth Avenue
Kingston ON K7M 1W9
Phone: (613) 546-2321
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:04 Jun 1996 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GREGORY PAUL BARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Other - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 1992 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Oct 2001 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 12 Oct 2001 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 09 Apr 2002 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 2003 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Feb 2022 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 22 Feb 2022 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Mar 2022 |