THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 18:33:53 PM
Dickie, Andrew John Dundas
CPSO#:
63687
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jun 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jul 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
RS McLaughlin Durham Regional
Cancer Centre
Suite C2 160F
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 4808
Fax: (905) 433-4577
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREW JOHN DUNDAS DICKIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DICKIE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 6 - Thoracic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 7 - Thoracic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 1992 |