THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 15:09:28 PM
Meinert, Paul Christian
CPSO#:
63683
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
09 Aug 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Meinert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 8 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:08 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 1996 to 30 Apr 1996
EL - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 03 Feb 1997 to 28 Feb 1997
EL - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1992 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 27 Oct 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Feb 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1998 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1999 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2022 |